+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On November 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0796
- Effective Date October 29, 2009
On October 29, 2009 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On October 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses
On October 29, 2009 in the House:
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 114-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 19, 2009 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Lou Lang
On October 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Dan Cronin
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 051-000-000
On October 16, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 16, 2009
On October 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. Dan Cronin
On October 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 15, 2009
On August 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Gaming; 006-000-000
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Gaming
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Cronin
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2009
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009
- Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act and the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Provides for the separation of the Illinois Racing Board from the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 505/12 - from Ch. 23, par. 5012