+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0695
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date November 5, 2007
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Health
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Health
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - June 1, 2007
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Righter
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Public Health
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass Public Health; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the members of the Genetic and Metabolic Diseases Advisory Committee shall be appointed by the Director of Public Health (instead of the Director of Public Health and the Governor). Deletes language specifying the length of each members' term of membership, reappointment to the Committee following consecutive terms, member requirements for subcommittee or special project participation, and the appointment of ex officio members. Changes the name of the Phenylketonuria Testing Act to the Metabolic Disorder Testing Act. Provides that in accordance with the timetable specified in the provision, The Department of Public Health shall provide all newborns with expanded screening tests for the presence of certain Lysosomal Storage Disorders known as Krabbe, Pompe, Gaucher, Fabry, and Niemann-Pick. Provides that the testing shall begin within 6 months following the occurrence of all of the following: (i) the registration with the federal Food and Drug Administration of the necessary reagents; (ii) the availability of the necessary reagents from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention; (iii) the availability of quality assurance testing methodology for these processes; and (iv) the acquisition and installment by the Department of the equipment necessary to implement the expanded screening tests. Provides that it is the goal of the Act that the expanded screening for the specified Lysosomal Storage Disorders begins within 3 years after the effective date of the Act. Provides that the Department is authorized to implement an additional fee for the screening prior to beginning the testing in order to accumulate the resources for start-up and other costs associated with implementation of the screening and thereafter to support the costs associated with screening and follow-up programs for the specified Lysosomal Storage Disorders. Provides that the Department shall supply the necessary metabolic treatment formulas where practicable for diagnosed cases of amino acid metabolism disorders, including phenylketonuria, organic acid and fatty acid oxidation disorders for as long as medically indicated, when the product is not available through other State agencies. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the members of the Genetic and Metabolic Diseases Advisory Committee shall be appointed by the Director of Public Health (instead of the Director of Public Health and the Governor). Deletes language specifying the length of each members' term of membership, reappointment to the Committee following consecutive terms, member requirements for subcommittee or special project participation, and the appointment of ex officio members. Changes the name of the Phenylketonuria Testing Act to the Metabolic Disorder Testing Act. Provides that in accordance with the timetable specified in the provision, The Department of Public Health shall provide all newborns with expanded screening tests for the presence of certain Lysosomal Storage Disorders known as Krabbe, Pompe, Gaucher, Fabry, and Niemann-Pick. Provides that the testing shall begin within 6 months following the occurrence of all of the following: (i) the registration with the federal Food and Drug Administration of the necessary reagents; (ii) the availability of the necessary reagents from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention; (iii) the availability of quality assurance testing methodology for these processes; and (iv) the acquisition and installment by the Department of the equipment necessary to implement the expanded screening tests. Provides that it is the goal of the Act that the expanded screening for the specified Lysosomal Storage Disorders begins within 3 years after the effective date of the Act. Provides that the Department is authorized to implement an additional fee for the screening prior to beginning the testing in order to accumulate the resources for start-up and other costs associated with implementation of the screening and thereafter to support the costs associated with screening and follow-up programs for the specified Lysosomal Storage Disorders. Provides that the Department shall supply the necessary metabolic treatment formulas where practicable for diagnosed cases of amino acid metabolism disorders, including phenylketonuria, organic acid and fatty acid oxidation disorders for as long as medically indicated, when the product is not available through other State agencies. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4
Makes a technical correction. Provides that 6 months following the registration of the necessary reagents with the federal Food and Drug Administration and the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention has available quality assurance testing methodology for these processes (instead of July 1, 2008), the Department of Public Health shall provide all newborns with expanded screening tests for the presence of Lysosomal Storage Disorders known as Krabbe, Pompe, Gaucher, Fabry, and Niemann-Pick.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 30 ILCS 105/8h -
- 410 ILCS 240/2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4904