+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
- Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 14, 2017: SB1566 - Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor