+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 009-005-000
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2012
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2012
- Postponed - Executive
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 820 ILCS 105/3 - from Ch. 48, par. 1003
- 820 ILCS 105/4 - from Ch. 48, par. 1004
- 820 ILCS 105/4a - from Ch. 48, par. 1004a
- 820 ILCS 105/12 - from Ch. 48, par. 1012
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor