+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (113)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0690
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-019-001
- Verified
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Verified
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-054-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 26, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted 056-052-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David B. Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David B. Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David B. Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David B. Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David B. Reis
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Will Guzzardi
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Peter Breen
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-005-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-019-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Biss
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-003-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 001
Removes the effective date Section.
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, but with the following changes: In a provision defining terms: (i) removes the terms "access to care and information protocols" and "material information" and their corresponding definitions; and (ii) defines "undue delay" as unreasonable delay that causes impairment of the patient's health. Makes changes to a provision concerning the duty of physicians and other health care personnel. Removes a provision concerning the duty to enact and comply with access to care and information protocols and instead provides that all health care facilities shall adopt written access to care and information protocols that are designed to ensure that conscience-based objections do not cause impairment of patients' health and that explain how conscience-based objections will be addressed in a timely manner to facilitate patient health care services. Provides that certain protections under the Act only apply if conscience-based refusals occur in accordance with these protocols. Provides that the protocols must, at a minimum, address certain matters. Removes changes made to a provision concerning discrimination by employers or institutions. Adds a January 1, 2016 effective date.
Senate Amendment 002
Makes a change in the Section concerning findings and policy. Provides that the amendatory provisions are applicable notwithstanding other provisions of the Health Care Right of Conscience Act or any other law (rather than "notwithstanding any other law").
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 745 ILCS 70/2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5302
- 745 ILCS 70/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5303
- 745 ILCS 70/6.1 new -
- 745 ILCS 70/6.2 new -
- 745 ILCS 70/7 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5307
- 745 ILCS 70/9 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5309
- 745 ILCS 70/7 -
- 745 ILCS 70/6 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5306