+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0397
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
- Second Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: SB0156 - Third Reading
April 30, 2019: SB0156 - Judiciary - Criminal
March 6, 2019: SB0156 - Third Reading
February 20, 2019: SB0156 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor