+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0604
- Effective Date August 26, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee; 007-000-000
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes a provision that required the provider of physical or occupational therapy to furnish certain records in order to establish that initial or continued treatment is resulting in an approved clinical status.