+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor