+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0184
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 22, 2011
On June 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the criminal trespass to real property statute does not apply to: (1) a person authorized to serve process under the Code of Civil Procedure; or (2) a special process server appointed by the circuit court.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/21-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 21-3