+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David Harris
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the checkoff shall be included on the individual income tax form for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2015 (instead of taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2014). Makes technical corrections.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2015: SB1549 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 14, 2015
March 11, 2015: SB1549 - Revenue - Mar 11, 2015
March 11, 2015: SCA0001 - Revenue - Mar 11, 2015
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor