+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03 - May 31, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On May 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2003: SB1548 - Third Reading - Friday, May 30, 2003
March 20, 2003: SB1548 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor