+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor