+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0296
- Effective Date July 22, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 010-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the applicant for licensure as a certified registered nurse anesthetist without the required graduate degree must apply on or before December 31, 2006.