+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0055
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2009
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009
- Second Reading
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2009
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that for purposes of voting on amendments to an association's bylaws, a unit owner who is in arrears on the unit owner's regular or (instead of and) separate assessments for 60 days or more, shall not be counted for purposes of determining if a quorum is present.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that for purposes of voting on amendments to an association's bylaws, a unit owner who is in arrears on the unit owner's regular or (instead of and) separate assessments for 60 days or more, shall not be counted for purposes of determining if a quorum is present.
+ − Statute Amended
- 765 ILCS 605/18 - from Ch. 30, par. 318
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2009: SB0154 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 28, 2009
April 2, 2009: SB0154 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 02, 2009
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor