+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0114
- Effective Date July 19, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-016-001
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-002-000
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-019-000
- Verified
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 013-005-000
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link