+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2019: SB1522 - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor