+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Assigned to Executive
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that, for the purpose of awarding attorneys' fees and costs under the Act, a requester prevails if he or she obtains relief through (i) a judicial order, (ii) an enforceable written agreement or consent decree, or (iii) a voluntary or unilateral change in position after suit has been filed under the Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 5 ILCS 140/5 - from Ch. 116, par. 205
- 5 ILCS 140/5 -
- 5 ILCS 140/11 - from Ch. 116, par. 211
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor