+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor