+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0059
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2003
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983 and the Limited Liability Company Act. Removes a corporation's ability to change the address of its registered office or change its registered agent simply by indicating the change in its annual report, and removes a requirement that a statement of such a change be filed for record with the county recorder. Removes a limited liability company's ability to renew a reservation of a specified name for additional 90-day periods.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983 and the Limited Liability Company Act. Removes a corporation's ability to change the address of its registered office or change its registered agent simply by indicating the change in its annual report, and removes a requirement that a statement of such a change be filed for record with the county recorder. Removes a limited liability company's ability to renew a reservation of a specified name for additional 90-day periods.
+ − Statutes Amended (43)
- 765 ILCS 1036/50 -
- 805 ILCS 5/1.15 - from Ch. 32, par. 1.15
- 805 ILCS 5/2.10 - from Ch. 32, par. 2.10
- 805 ILCS 5/4.10 - from Ch. 32, par. 4.10
- 805 ILCS 5/5.20 - from Ch. 32, par. 5.20
- 805 ILCS 5/10.35 - from Ch. 32, par. 10.35
- 805 ILCS 5/11.37 - from Ch.32, par. 11.37
- 805 ILCS 5/11.45 - from Ch. 32, par. 11.45
- 805 ILCS 5/11.75 - from Ch. 32, par 11.75
- 805 ILCS 5/12.35 - from Ch. 32, par. 12.35
- 805 ILCS 5/12.40 - from Ch. 32, par. 12.40
- 805 ILCS 5/13.40 - from Ch. 32, par. 13.40
- 805 ILCS 5/13.45 - from Ch. 32, par. 13.45
- 805 ILCS 5/13.50 - from Ch. 32, par. 13.50
- 805 ILCS 5/13.55 - from Ch. 32, par. 13.55
- 805 ILCS 5/13.75 -
- 805 ILCS 5/14.05 - from Ch. 32, par. 14.05
- 805 ILCS 5/15.05 - from Ch. 32, par. 15.05
- 805 ILCS 5/15.80 - from Ch. 32, par. 15.80
- 805 ILCS 5/15.95 - from Ch. 32, par. 15.95
- 805 ILCS 5/15.97 - from Ch. 32, par. 15.97
- 805 ILCS 105/101.15 - from Ch. 32, par. 101.15
- 805 ILCS 105/102.10 - from Ch. 32, par 102.10
- 805 ILCS 105/105.20 - from Ch. 32, par. 105.20
- 805 ILCS 105/111.37 - from Ch. 32, par. 111.37
- 805 ILCS 105/112.40 - from Ch. 32, par. 112.40
- 805 ILCS 105/113.40 - from Ch. 32, par. 113.40
- 805 ILCS 105/113.50 - from Ch. 32, par. 113.50
- 805 ILCS 105/113. 55 - from Ch. 32, par. 113.55
- 805 ILCS 105/114.05 - from Ch. 32, par. 114.05
- 805 ILCS 105/115.10 - from Ch. 32, par. 115.10
- 805 ILCS 105/115.20 - from Ch. 32, par. 115.20
- 805 ILCS 180/1-10 -
- 805 ILCS 180/1-15 -
- 805 ILCS 180/1-20 -
- 805 ILCS 180/5-47 new -
- 805 ILCS 180/5-48 new -
- 805 ILCS 180/35-3 -
- 805 ILCS 180/35-30 -
- 805 ILCS 180/45-1 -
- 805 ILCS 180/45-35 -
- 805 ILCS 180/45-47 new -
- 805 ILCS 180/50-10 -