+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor