+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0294
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 016-001-000
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert F. Flider
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon