+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0152
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2013
- Second Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2013
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff