+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (101)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0914
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 20, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Silvana Tabares
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sue Scherer
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. André Thapedi
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - December 1, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Sente
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-005-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Fred Crespo
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ron Sandack
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John C. D'Amico
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Demmer
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert Martwick
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dan Brady
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Sente
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2015
- Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the income tax credit awarded for the restoration and preservation of a qualified historic structure located in a River Edge Redevelopment Zone sunsets on January 1, 2018 (currently, January 1, 2017). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that any municipality with 1,000,000 or more inhabitants and any county may adopt an ordinance to increase the maximum amount of the general homestead exemption to $14,000 in that county or municipality (currently, the maximum amount is $7,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $6,000 in all other counties). Provides that, with respect to a municipality with 1,000,000 or more inhabitants, any reduction above $7,000 shall apply only as to levies that are imposed exclusively within such municipality. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the tax exemption for property used for religious purposes.