+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0443
- Effective Date August 25, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
- Arrived in House
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.6a - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.6a
- 105 ILCS 5/14-13.01 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-13.01
- 105 ILCS 5/27-22 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-22
- 105 ILCS 128/15 -
- 105 ILCS 128/20 -