+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On January 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- First Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Commission to Study Disproportionate Justice Impact Act. Makes a technical change to a Section concerning the short title.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45 - from Ch. 127, par. 1005-45
- 5 ILCS 430/5-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/5-10.10 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/5-70 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/50-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/70-5 -
- 15 ILCS 305/14 -
- 25 ILCS 170/4.8 new -
- 25 ILCS 170/5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/10 - from Ch. 63, par. 180
- 775 ILCS 5/2-108 new -
- 20 ILCS 4085/1 -
+ − Votes (3)
January 9, 2021: SB1485 - Health Care Availability & Access
April 12, 2019: SB1485 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: SB1485 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor