+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 010-004-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Human Rights; 006-003-000
- Assigned to Education
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Directed to Multiple Committees Human Rights, Education
- Assigned to Human Rights
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/34-2.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-2.1
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2021: SB0148 - Third Reading
April 13, 2021: SB0148 - Education
March 18, 2021: SB0148 - Human Rights
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor