+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On October 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 15, 2009
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
On July 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 540/3-2 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.403-2
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2009: SB1472 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 28, 2009
March 26, 2009: SB1472 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 26, 2009
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor