+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (96)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0611
- Effective Date December 27, 2013
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Recedes
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 117-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 117-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Rep. John E. Bradley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Rep. John E. Bradley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Non-Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Non-Concurs 059-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2013
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-047-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
- Judicial Note Filed
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2013
- Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Project Labor Agreements Act. Specifies that the term "public works project" includes, for the purposes of the Act, any corrective action performed pursuant to Title XVI of the Environmental Protection Act for which payment from the Underground Storage Tank Fund is requested. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency to determine whether a project labor agreement must be executed for a corrective action. Provides that if the Agency determines that a project labor agreement is required for a corrective action, then the owner or operator must certify that the corrective action was (i) performed under a project labor agreement that meets the requirements of Section 25 of the Project Labor Agreements Act and (ii) implemented in a manner consistent with the terms and conditions of the Project Labor Agreements Act and in full compliance with all statutes, regulations, and Executive Orders as required under that Act and the Prevailing Wage Act. Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Specifies that the term "public works" includes, for the purposes of that Act, any corrective action performed pursuant to Title XVI of the Environmental Protection Act for which payment from the Underground Storage Tank Fund is requested. Effective August 1, 2013.
House Amendment 002
Amends the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. Provides that any establishment subject to inspection under the Act that believes, or has reason to believe, that an adulterated or misbranded meat or meat food product received by or originating from the establishment has entered into commerce shall promptly notify the Director of Agriculture. Provides that the Director shall require that each Type I establishment subject to inspection under this Act to meet minimum recall and documentation procedures. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Changes the minimum recall and documentation procedures that the Director of Agriculture shall require for Type I establishments.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 225 ILCS 650/5.1 -
- 30 ILCS 571/10 -
- 415 ILCS 5/57.7 -
- 415 ILCS 5/57.8 -
- 820 ILCS 130/2 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-2