+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0319
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 053-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Motion Prevailed
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Postponed - Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Postponed - Public Health
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Nursing Home Care Act, the IDD/DD Community Care Act, the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act, the Hospital Licensing Act, and the Health Care Surrogate Act. Deletes "DNR" from the title of the "DNR/POLST" form that outlines advance directives and life-sustaining care measures for a patient.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes: Provides that licensed pharmacists may dispense an opioid antidote (rather than antagonist) in accordance with written, standardized procedures or protocols developed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with the Department of Public Health and the Department of Human Services if the procedures or protocols are filed at the pharmacy before implementation and are available to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation upon request (rather than at the pharmacist's place of practice and with the Board of Pharmacy before implementation). Removes provisions concerning the availability of opioid antidotes by prescription. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill with the following changes. Replaces references of opioid antagonists with opioid antidotes. Provides that health care practitioners may prescribe naloxone antidotes in the name of a licensed pharmacist in accordance with this Act, and pharmacists may dispense opioid antidotes pursuant to a prescription issued in the name of an authorized entity. Provides that prescriptions are valid for a period of 2 years. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 225 ILCS 85/19.1 new -
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-600 -
- 210 ILCS 45/2-104.2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4152-104.2
- 210 ILCS 47/2-104.2 -
- 210 ILCS 50/3.57 -
- 210 ILCS 85/6.19 -
- 755 ILCS 40/65 -