+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Insurance
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor