+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Sen. Louis S. Viverito; , Cullerton, Hendon, Petka and Roskam, Motion to Re-refer, pursuant to Senate Rule 3-7. Re-referred to the Senate Rules Committee.
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 35/1 - from Ch. 37, par. 72.1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor