+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 805 ILCS 5/15.35 - from Ch. 32, par. 15.35
+ − Vote
March 25, 2015: SB0145 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor