+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-002-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2017: SB1448 - Transportation
April 6, 2017: SCA0001 - Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor