+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On November 2, 2015 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Administrative Review Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a party of record shall not be named as a defendant in an action to review a final decision of an administrative agency if the party of record is a private citizen who was not acting in an official capacity or whose participation in the agency proceeding was limited to attendance or testimony at a public hearing or submission of written comments to the agency.
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/3-107 - from Ch. 110, par. 3-107
+ − Votes (4)
October 20, 2015: SB1447 - Judiciary - Civil - Oct 20, 2015
April 16, 2015: SB1447 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 16, 2015
March 17, 2015: SB1447 - Judiciary - Mar 17, 2015
March 17, 2015: SCA0002 - Judiciary - Mar 17, 2015
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor