+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Environment & Energy; 007-000-000
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry D. Woolard
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry D. Woolard
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 765 ILCS 530/1 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 9651