+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0008
- Effective Date June 6, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford