+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor