+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -