+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-002
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that any person shall be guilty of a Class A misdemeanor and shall have his or her driving privileges suspended by the Secretary of State for a period of 6 months for the first offense, for a period of one year for a second offense, and revoked permanently for a third or subsequent offense where he or she knowingly permits a gathering at a residence which he or she occupies of two or more persons where any one or more of the persons is under 21 years of age and certain factors apply. Requires the clerk of the court to forward to the Secretary of State any conviction entered under the provision within 5 days after the conviction in a form and manner as prescribed by the Secretary of State. Effective January 1, 2008.
+ − Statute Amended
- 235 ILCS 5/6-16 - from Ch. 43, par. 131