+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 820 ILCS 130/2 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-2
- 820 ILCS 130/3 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor