+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0008
- Effective Date May 28, 2003
- Governor Approved
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Bob Biggins
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2003: SB1418 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2003
March 20, 2003: SB1418 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor