+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
- Re-assigned to Executive
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5 -
- 720 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-1
- 725 ILCS 5/113-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 113-3
- 725 ILCS 5/119-1 -
- 725 ILCS 105/10 - from Ch. 38, par. 208-10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor