+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0492
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
On May 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Barack Obama
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 041-012-000
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2003: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 29, 2003
May 21, 2003: SB1414 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 21, 2003
April 8, 2003: SB1414 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 08, 2003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor