+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/2-101 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-101
- 40 ILCS 5/2-105 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-105