+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
- Session Sine Die
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur-Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)-Referred to Rules.
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur-Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)-Referred to Rules.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Education; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Education; 006-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Education
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Education
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 098-018-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - June 1, 2004
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Miguel del Valle
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Susana Mendoza
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 010-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2004
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 14, 2004
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 009-000-007
- Sponsor Removed Rep. David E. Miller
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-022-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; del Valle
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Adopted Education; 008-003-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-002-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to May 31, 2003
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 3-9(a) (ii), regarding the March 13, 2003 reporting deadline.
- Postponed - Education
- Assigned to Education
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill as engrossed with the following changes. Changes the dates in provisions concerning State policy and legislative intent, school breakfast programs, summer food service programs, and reporting school breakfast program information. Provides that a breakfast program must be implemented and operated in each school building (instead of school) within the school district in which at least 40% or more of the students are eligible for free or reduced-price lunches based upon the count on October 31 of the previous year. Provides that a school board shall determine which schools will be required to implement and operate a school breakfast program using the data from the previous school year. Specifies allowable costs for school breakfast program reimbursement. Allows a district to opt out of the school breakfast program requirement if it is determined that the expense reimbursement would not fully cover the costs of implementing and operating a program. Provides for the regional superintendent of schools to make the decision, with appeals of decisions from districts and residents of districts heard by a joint committee made up of the members of the House Elementary and Secondary Education Committee and Senate Education Committee. Provides that a school district may not attempt to opt out of the school breakfast program requirement by requesting a mandate waiver under the School Code. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill as engrossed with the following changes. Changes the dates in provisions concerning State policy and legislative intent, school breakfast programs, summer food service programs, and reporting school breakfast program information. Provides that a breakfast program must be implemented and operated in each school building (instead of school) within the school district in which at least 40% or more of the students are eligible for free or reduced-price lunches based upon the count on October 31 of the previous year. Provides that a school board shall determine which schools will be required to implement and operate a school breakfast program using the data from the previous school year. Specifies allowable costs for school breakfast program reimbursement. Allows a district to opt out of the school breakfast program requirement if it is determined that the expense reimbursement would not fully cover the costs of implementing and operating a program. Provides for the regional superintendent of schools to make the decision, with appeals of decisions from districts and residents of districts heard by a joint committee made up of the members of the House Elementary and Secondary Education Committee and Senate Education Committee. Provides that a school district may not attempt to opt out of the school breakfast program requirement by requesting a mandate waiver under the School Code. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes changes concerning which schools are to have school breakfast programs. Removes provisions requiring school districts and schools to develop written plans to administer the breakfast programs. Makes changes concerning summer food service programs. Further amends the School Breakfast and Lunch Program Act. Removes the requirement that applications be filed through the regional superintendent of schools. Removes the amendatory provisions that require a school district to certify children as eligible for free meals and require the Department of Human Services to provide information about a child's status. Provides instead that the Department of Human Services shall work with the State Board of Education to certify all children that are eligible for participation.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill as amended by Senate amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Requires a board of education to implement a school breakfast program in each school within its district only if at least 40% or more students are eligible for free or reduced-price lunches. Removes the requirement that a board of education operate a summer food service program, identify a non-profit or private agency to sponsor a program, or collaborate with a non-profit or private agency to provide the program (instead, strongly encourages a board to operate a program or identify an agency to sponsor a program). Provides that a summer food service program may (instead of shall) be supported by federal funds and commodities and other available State and local resources. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- New Act -
- 105 ILCS 125/2.5 -
- 105 ILCS 125/4 - from Ch. 122, par. 712.4
- 105 ILCS 125/5 - from Ch. 122, par. 712.5