+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0229
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 16, 2007
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2007
- Second Reading
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 150/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 223
- 730 ILCS 150/6 - from Ch. 38, par. 226
- 730 ILCS 152/120 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0014 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
February 23, 2007: SB0014 - Third Reading - Friday, February 23, 2007
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor