+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0008
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Effective Date June 29, 2007
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 074-013-000
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto June 29, 2007
- Arrived in House
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 043-003-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed Calendar Total Veto June 28, 2007
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 007-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-004-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 8, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes a provision authorizing the Department of Revenue to require, by rule, electronic filings and electronic funds transfers.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Requires all returns to be made on or before the last day of the first month following the close of a calendar quarter. Requires semi-weekly payments for employers who are required to withhold more than $12,000 (now $3,000) in any calendar quarter. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to allow annual returns only if the aggregate amounts required to be withheld do not exceed $1,000 for the calendar year. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules to (i) increase the threshold dollar amounts at which employers are required to make semi-weekly payments and (ii) require electronic filing and payments from employers are required to make semi-weekly payments. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes a provision authorizing the Department of Revenue to require, by rule, electronic filings and electronic funds transfers.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 5/704 - from Ch. 120, par. 7-704
- 35 ILCS 5/704A new -