+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0145
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Corrects a citation.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill. Makes the following changes: makes changes to defined terms. Adds additional defined terms. Allows the State Treasurer to enter into agreements with other states to either allow Illinois residents to participate in an ABLE account plan operated by another state or to allow residents of other states to participate in the Illinois ABLE plan. Requires the designated beneficiary of an ABLE account to be a resident of Illinois or a resident of a contracting state. Provides that plan assets are not subject to claims by creditors of the State and may not be used as security for a loan. Requires the State Treasurer to promote awareness of the availability and advantages of the ABLE account plan as a way to assist individuals and families in saving private funds for the purpose of supporting individuals with disabilities but prohibits the State Treasurer from promoting or accepting contributions for ABLE accounts until the Internal Revenue Service has issued its final regulations concerning ABLE accounts. Requires the account administrator to annually prepare and adopt a written statement of investment policy that includes a risk management and oversight program. Makes other changes concerning the administration of the ABLE account plan. Creates the Illinois ABLE Accounts Administrative Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Illinois ABLE Accounts Administrative Fund.