+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Firearms
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor