+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 10, 2015
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-001
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to issue an annual Freestanding Emergency Center license to a facility that complies with certain requirements. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes: Makes changes to references to the National Institute for Certification in Engineering Technologies certificate in fire protection technology automatic sprinkler system layout.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Provides that after January 1, 2016, no initial licenses shall be issued under the Section allowing certain individuals to be exempt from the requirements of the Act (previously repealed the Section).